### LuVbeingYoungster

Math Questions  -

Solve if u r a genius !

11 x 11 = 4
22 x 22 = 16
33 x 33 = ???﻿
21
3

right  :)﻿

no , well tried, but it's wrong :/
try again :)﻿

My first guess was just glancing at it...  I've analyzed the problem and found not only the solution 36, but also the general mathematical model for this equation which is 4n².  In other words I can now quickly solve it for any number...

Breaking it down we can determine the algorithm by hand.
1*1 + 1*1 + 1*1 +1*1 = 4
2*2 + 2*2 + 2*2 + 2*2 = 16
3*3 + 3*3 + 3*3 + 3*3 = 36

We can thus simplify the algorithm and condense it into a mathematical model for n.

Looking at line 3, there are 4 terms each term uses n².
3² + 3² + 3² + 3²

We could represent this quantity using factorization...
4 * 3²

Now we can write a general solution to model n
f(n)= 4 n²

Proof by example
n(1) =  4(1)² = 4*1 = 4
n(2) =  4(2)² = 4*4 = 16
n(3) =  4(3)² = 4*9 = 36
n(4) =  4(4)² = 4*16 = 64
n(5) =  4(5)² = 4*25 = 100﻿

Can be?
1+1+1+1=4
2(2)(2)(2)=16
3*3*3*3= 7.6 x 10*12    ?﻿

I think you'll like my new solution, it is not only correct but it takes it a step further and devises a general mathematical model which is 100% accurate.  Let's see any one else arrive at that :)﻿

Yes , you have very good solutions..all of these works too :)
right answer , , ,   &  :)
Wrong answer  &  ...try again :)
Make your choice out of them  :)﻿

can you solve the series as:
1 , 7, 17,31,49,71,?

What should be the next number﻿

That's an easy one
If we look at how much is being added each time we see the pattern 6 10 14 18 22.  So each time you are adding for more to the previous summation.

Thus 22 + 4 = 26
71+26 = 97

For fun I'll try to find that equations general solution...﻿

97  :)﻿

right answer   , , ,  :)﻿

Here is the general solution to your problem
For n = 0
1

Else For n = 1 to ∞
1 + 6 + Σ4(n-1)﻿
Translate

81﻿

64﻿

81﻿

It's 18!

11*11 = 121 - add the digits = 4
22*22 = 484 - add the digits = 16
33*33 = 1089 - add the digits =18!﻿

36﻿

right answer , , , ,  &  :)

wrong answer , , , , , , , , , ,  & ...try again :)﻿

18 or 81﻿

11 x 11= 121 =1+2+1 =4
22 x 22 =484= 4+8+4 = 16
33 x33 = 1089
1+0+8+9 = 18﻿

(1plus1 =2 ) x (1plus1=2)= 4
(2 plus 2= 4) x (2 plus 2=4)= 16
(3 plus 3= 6) x (3 plus 3=6)= 36﻿

18 (since 11x11 = 121 [sum of digits =4] 22x22 = 484 [sum of digits = 16] 33x33 = 1089 [sum of digits = 18])﻿

36﻿

How you are saying it is 81? i cant understand how it will come as 81.... i hope 36 is correct upto 3*3.....

If it is given as 33*33 = 18 then 44*44=?? it would be calculated as philip hadkins suggested.... So AFA my knowledge 36 and 81 correct :). Hope i am correct﻿

11x11=121, Digital index of 121 = 4
22x22=484, Digital index of 484 = 16
33x33=1089, Digital index of 1089 = 18