Solve if u r a genius !

11 x 11 = 4

22 x 22 = 16

33 x 33 = ???

11 x 11 = 4

22 x 22 = 16

33 x 33 = ???

View 50 previous comments

- (1plus1 =2 ) x (1plus1=2)= 4

(2 plus 2= 4) x (2 plus 2=4)= 16

(3 plus 3= 6) x (3 plus 3=6)= 36Jan 16, 2013 - 18 (since 11x11 = 121 [sum of digits =4] 22x22 = 484 [sum of digits = 16] 33x33 = 1089 [sum of digits = 18])Jan 17, 2013
- Jan 20, 2013
- 18Jan 30, 2013
- How you are saying it is 81? i cant understand how it will come as 81.... i hope 36 is correct upto 3*3.....

If it is given as 33*33 = 18 then 44*44=?? it would be calculated as philip hadkins suggested.... So AFA my knowledge 36 and 81 correct :). Hope i am correctJul 2, 2013 - 11x11=121, Digital index of 121 = 4

22x22=484, Digital index of 484 = 16

33x33=1089, Digital index of 1089 = 18

Hence, answer = 18Dec 2, 2013